Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 6, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:05 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Edming
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Representative Shelton added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Representative Vining added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Representatives Rettinger and C. Anderson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representatives Palmeri, Joers, Bare and Steffen added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Representative Krug added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Representative Riemer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|