House
|
03/04/2024
|
Published 3-5-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 101
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-27-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 29, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Hesselbein, Carpenter, L. Johnson, Roys, Smith, Spreitzer, Pfaff, Agard and Wirch
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Brooks added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 92, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|