House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Representative Nedweski added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Representative Macco added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Representative Conley added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Representative Ortiz-Velez added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Representative Riemer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Introduced |