House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 3 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Moses | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Senator James added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Introduced |