Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:55 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced |