House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Representative Behnke added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Representative Gundrum added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced |