House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 2 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Duchow added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Introduced |