House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Senator Ballweg added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Introduced |