House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:57 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|