House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:58 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Introduced |