House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 11, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Introduced |