House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 206
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-14-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 11:04 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Edming added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Michalski added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representatives Kurtz and Allen added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|