Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Snyder
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 11:06 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 6, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Snyder
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|