House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced |