House | 03/29/2024 | Published 3-30-2024 | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 259 | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Report correctly enrolled on 3-14-2024 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Read a third time and concurred in | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 11:14 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Introduced |