House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nedweski | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Introduced |