1 | 1 | | LRB-4667/1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | FFK:skw |
---|
3 | 3 | | 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 1189 |
---|
5 | 5 | | April 9, 2024 - Introduced by Representative MCGUIRE. Referred to Committee on |
---|
6 | 6 | | Education. |
---|
7 | 7 | | ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE*** |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 20.255 (2) (dq) and 115.453 of the |
---|
9 | 9 | | statutes; relating to: grants for participation in esports competitions and |
---|
10 | 10 | | making an appropriation. |
---|
11 | 11 | | Analysis by the Legislative Reference Bureau |
---|
12 | 12 | | This bill creates a pilot program under which the Department of Public |
---|
13 | 13 | | Instruction awards grants to eligible teams for expenses related to participating in |
---|
14 | 14 | | esports competitions. Under the bill, an esports competition is an organized, |
---|
15 | 15 | | multiplayer video game competition. To be eligible for an esports participation grant, |
---|
16 | 16 | | a team must consist of pupils and at least one mentor and must demonstrate to DPI |
---|
17 | 17 | | that it will provide matching funds equal to the amount of the grant. Under the bill, |
---|
18 | 18 | | DPI must administer the esports participation grant pilot program in the 2024-25, |
---|
19 | 19 | | 2025-26, and 2026-27 school years. Finally, the bill requires DPI to publish a list |
---|
20 | 20 | | of grant recipients on its website and to submit a report on the pilot program to the |
---|
21 | 21 | | legislature. |
---|
22 | 22 | | For further information see the state and local fiscal estimate, which will be |
---|
23 | 23 | | printed as an appendix to this bill. |
---|
24 | 24 | | The people of the state of Wisconsin, represented in senate and assembly, do |
---|
25 | 25 | | enact as follows: |
---|
26 | 26 | | SECTION 1. 20.005 (3) (schedule) of the statutes: at the appropriate place, insert |
---|
27 | 27 | | the following amounts for the purposes indicated: |
---|
28 | 28 | | 1 |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 3 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 4 |
---|
32 | 32 | | 5 - 2 -2023 - 2024 Legislature LRB-4667/1 |
---|
33 | 33 | | FFK:skw |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 1 ASSEMBLY BILL 1189 |
---|
35 | 35 | | 2023-24 2024-25 |
---|
36 | 36 | | 20.255Public instruction, department of |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) AIDS FOR LOCAL EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMING |
---|
38 | 38 | | (dq)Esports participation grant pro |
---|
39 | 39 | | gram GRP A -0- 250,000 |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 2. 20.255 (2) (dq) of the statutes is created to read: |
---|
41 | 41 | | 20.255 (2) (dq) Esports participation grant program. The amounts in the |
---|
42 | 42 | | schedule for grants to eligible teams under s. 115.453. No moneys may be |
---|
43 | 43 | | encumbered from this appropriation after June 30, 2027. |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 3. 115.453 of the statutes is created to read: |
---|
45 | 45 | | 115.453 Esports participation grants; pilot program. (1) In this section: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (a) “Allowable expenses" includes equipment, software, fees, and supplies |
---|
47 | 47 | | required to participate in an esports competition and a stipend for a mentor of an |
---|
48 | 48 | | eligible team. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (b) “Eligible team" means a team that consists of pupils and at least one mentor. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (c) “Esports competition" means an organized, multiplayer video game |
---|
51 | 51 | | competition. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) (a) By no later than April 1, 2025, April 1, 2026, and April 1, 2027, |
---|
53 | 53 | | respectively, the department shall notify school boards, operators of charter schools |
---|
54 | 54 | | under s. 118.40 (2r) and (2x), governing bodies of private schools, and administrators |
---|
55 | 55 | | of home-based private educational programs that applications for grants to |
---|
56 | 56 | | participate in one or more esports competitions will be accepted from eligible teams |
---|
57 | 57 | | until a date set forth in the notice. As a condition of receiving a grant under this |
---|
58 | 58 | | section, an applicant eligible team shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the |
---|
59 | 59 | | 1 |
---|
60 | 60 | | 2 |
---|
61 | 61 | | 3 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 4 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 5 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 6 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 7 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 8 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 9 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 10 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 11 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 12 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 13 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 14 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 15 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 16 |
---|
75 | 75 | | 17 |
---|
76 | 76 | | 18 |
---|
77 | 77 | | 19 |
---|
78 | 78 | | 20 |
---|
79 | 79 | | 21 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 22 |
---|
81 | 81 | | 23 - 3 -2023 - 2024 Legislature |
---|
82 | 82 | | LRB-4667/1 |
---|
83 | 83 | | FFK:skw |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 3 |
---|
85 | 85 | | ASSEMBLY BILL 1189 |
---|
86 | 86 | | department that the applicant eligible team will provide matching funds in an |
---|
87 | 87 | | amount equal to the amount awarded under this section. |
---|
88 | 88 | | (b) In the 2024-25, 2025-26, and 2026-27 school years, from the appropriation |
---|
89 | 89 | | under s. 20.255 (2) (dq), the department shall award grants to eligible teams selected |
---|
90 | 90 | | from the applicants under par. (a). Grant funds awarded under this section may be |
---|
91 | 91 | | applied only towards allowable expenses. The department may not award more than |
---|
92 | 92 | | $10,000 to an eligible team in a school year. |
---|
93 | 93 | | (3) The department shall publish on its website a list of grant recipients and |
---|
94 | 94 | | submit to the appropriate standing committees of the legislature under s. 13.172 (3) |
---|
95 | 95 | | a report on the program under this section. |
---|
96 | 96 | | SECTION 4. 119.04 (1) of the statutes, as affected by 2023 Wisconsin Act 12, is |
---|
97 | 97 | | amended to read: |
---|
98 | 98 | | 119.04 (1) Subchapters IV, V and VII of ch. 115, ch. 121 and ss. 66.0235 (3) (c), |
---|
99 | 99 | | 66.0603 (1m) to (3), 115.01 (1) and (2), 115.28, 115.31, 115.33, 115.34, 115.343, |
---|
100 | 100 | | 115.345, 115.363, 115.364, 115.365 (3), 115.366, 115.367, 115.38 (2), 115.415, 115.445, |
---|
101 | 101 | | 115.453, 118.001 to 118.04, 118.045, 118.06, 118.07, 118.075, 118.076, 118.10, 118.12, |
---|
102 | 102 | | 118.124, 118.125 to 118.14, 118.145 (4), 118.15, 118.153, 118.16, 118.162, 118.163, |
---|
103 | 103 | | 118.164, 118.18, 118.19, 118.196, 118.20, 118.223, 118.225, 118.24 (1), (2) (c) to (f), (6), |
---|
104 | 104 | | (8), and (10), 118.245, 118.25, 118.255, 118.258, 118.291, 118.292, 118.293, 118.2935, |
---|
105 | 105 | | 118.30 to 118.43, 118.46, 118.50, 118.51, 118.52, 118.53, 118.55, 118.56, 120.12 (2m), |
---|
106 | 106 | | (4m), (5), and (15) to (27), 120.125, 120.13 (1), (2) (b) to (g), (3), (14), (17) to (19), (26), |
---|
107 | 107 | | (34), (35), (37), (37m), and (38), 120.137, 120.14, 120.20, 120.21 (3), and 120.25 are |
---|
108 | 108 | | applicable to a 1st class city school district and board but not, unless explicitly |
---|
109 | 109 | | 1 |
---|
110 | 110 | | 2 |
---|
111 | 111 | | 3 |
---|
112 | 112 | | 4 |
---|
113 | 113 | | 5 |
---|
114 | 114 | | 6 |
---|
115 | 115 | | 7 |
---|
116 | 116 | | 8 |
---|
117 | 117 | | 9 |
---|
118 | 118 | | 10 |
---|
119 | 119 | | 11 |
---|
120 | 120 | | 12 |
---|
121 | 121 | | 13 |
---|
122 | 122 | | 14 |
---|
123 | 123 | | 15 |
---|
124 | 124 | | 16 |
---|
125 | 125 | | 17 |
---|
126 | 126 | | 18 |
---|
127 | 127 | | 19 |
---|
128 | 128 | | 20 |
---|
129 | 129 | | 21 |
---|
130 | 130 | | 22 |
---|
131 | 131 | | 23 - 4 -2023 - 2024 Legislature LRB-4667/1 |
---|
132 | 132 | | FFK:skw |
---|
133 | 133 | | SECTION 4 ASSEMBLY BILL 1189 |
---|
134 | 134 | | provided in this chapter or in the terms of a contract, to the commissioner or to any |
---|
135 | 135 | | school transferred to an opportunity schools and partnership program. |
---|
136 | 136 | | (END) |
---|
137 | 137 | | 1 |
---|
138 | 138 | | 2 |
---|
139 | 139 | | 3 |
---|