House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Representative Melotik added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Representative Riemer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Senator Agard added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Introduced |