House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Representative Rozar added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Introduced |