Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Representatives C. Anderson and Gustafson added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|