House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:06 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Representatives O'Connor and Michalski added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Representative Moses added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|