House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 8-4-2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Representative Macco added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Representative Allen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Senator Nass added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|