House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goeben | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 4 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 4 | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/09/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Introduced |