House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Representative Moses added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Introduced |