House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-6-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 34
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Representative Duchow added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|