House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 8-4-2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 4, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|