Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 60, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Decision of the Chair appealed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neubauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 11, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 11, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Representative Schraa added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|