House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Subeck | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:06 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Withdrawn from committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Subeck | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Magnafici | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Representative Dittrich withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Representative Snyder added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |