Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:07 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Representative Macco added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/01/2023 | Representative Melotik added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/24/2023 | Representative Penterman withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |