House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Representative Considine added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |