House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 8, Noes 5 | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Senator Spreitzer withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Senator Roys withdrawn as a cosponsor | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Representative Ortiz-Velez withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Representative Subeck withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced |