House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/27/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Representatives Cabrera and Andraca added as coauthors | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |