House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced |