House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |