Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2023
|
Senators Hesselbein and Carpenter added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 82, Noes 11, Paired 4
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Representatives Snodgrass and Emerson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 13, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Representatives Joers and Andraca added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Representative Madison added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|