House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |