Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB18 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/07/2023

                            LRB-0781/1
MIM:kms&amn
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 18
February 7, 2023 - Introduced by Representatives TITTL, PENTERMAN, BALDEH,
KNODL, MURPHY, MURSAU, MYERS, ROZAR, SCHRAA, SPIROS, TUSLER,
VANDERMEER and WICHGERS, cosponsored by Senators JACQUE, BALLWEG,
CABRAL-GUEVARA, QUINN and WANGGAARD. Referred to Committee on State
Affairs.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
AN ACT to amend 40.22 (1), 40.22 (2m) (intro.), 40.22 (2r) (intro.) and 40.22 (3)
(intro.); and to create 40.26 (7) of the statutes; relating to: rehired teacher
annuitants.
Analysis by the Legislative Reference Bureau
Under current law, certain individuals who receive a retirement or disability
annuity from the Wisconsin Retirement System (WRS) and who are hired by an
employer that participates in the WRS must suspend that annuity and may not
receive a WRS annuity payment until the individual is no longer in a WRS-covered
position. This suspension applies to an individual who 1) has reached his or her
normal retirement date; 2) is appointed to a position with a WRS-participating
employer or provides employee services as a contractor to a WRS-participating
employer; and 3) is expected to work at least two-thirds of what is considered
full-time employment by the Department of Employee Trust Funds.
This bill creates an exception to this suspension if 1) the individual retired from
WRS-covered employment as a teacher for grades kindergarten to 12 after July 2,
2013; 2) at least 30 days have elapsed from the date the individual left WRS-covered
employment with a school district; 3) the individual is rehired as a substitute
teacher; 4) at the time the individual initially retires from a school district, the
individual does not have an agreement with any school district to return to
employment; 5) the individual elects to not become a participating employee at the
time the individual is rehired or enters into a contract after retirement; and 6) the
individual is hired between the effective date of the bill and August 1, 2026.  In other
1
2
3 - 2 -2023 - 2024  Legislature	LRB-0781/1
MIM:kms&amn
 ASSEMBLY BILL 18
words, the bill allows a WRS teacher annuitant to return to work as a substitute
teacher with a participating employer and elect to not become a participating
employee for purposes of the WRS and instead continue to receive his or her annuity
between the effective date of the bill and August 1, 2026.
For further information see the state and local fiscal estimate, which will be
printed as an appendix to this bill.
The people of the state of Wisconsin, represented in senate and assembly, do
enact as follows:
SECTION 1.  40.22 (1) of the statutes is amended to read:
40.22 (1) Except as otherwise provided in sub. (2) and s. 40.26 (6) and (7), each
employee currently in the service of, and receiving earnings from, a state agency or
other participating employer shall be included within the provisions of the Wisconsin
retirement system as a participating employee of that state agency or participating
employer.
SECTION 2.  40.22 (2m) (intro.) of the statutes is amended to read:
40.22 (2m) (intro.)  Except as otherwise provided in s. 40.26 (6) and (7), an
employee who was a participating employee before July 1, 2011, who is not expected
to work at least one-third of what is considered full-time employment by the
department, as determined by rule, and who is not otherwise excluded under sub. (2)
from becoming a participating employee shall become a participating employee if he
or she is subsequently employed by the state agency or other participating employer
for either of the following periods:
SECTION 3.  40.22 (2r) (intro.) of the statutes is amended to read:
40.22 (2r) (intro.)  Except as otherwise provided in s. 40.26 (6) and (7), an
employee who was not a participating employee before July 1, 2011, who is not
expected to work at least two-thirds of what is considered full-time employment by
the department, as determined by rule, and who is not otherwise excluded under sub.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19 - 3 -2023 - 2024  Legislature
LRB-0781/1
MIM:kms&amn
SECTION 3
 ASSEMBLY BILL 18
(2) from becoming a participating employee shall become a participating employee
if he or she is subsequently employed by the state agency or other participating
employer for either of the following periods:
SECTION 4.  40.22 (3) (intro.) of the statutes is amended to read:
40.22 (3) (intro.) Except as otherwise provided in s. 40.26 (6) and (7), a person
who qualifies as a participating employee shall be included within, and shall be
subject to, the Wisconsin retirement system effective on one of the following dates:
SECTION 5.  40.26 (7) of the statutes is created to read:
40.26 (7) During the period beginning on the effective date of this subsection
.... [LRB inserts date], and ending on August 1, 2026, subs. (1) to (5) do not apply to
a participant who applies for an annuity or lump sum payment during the period in
which at least 30 days have elapsed between the participant's termination of
employment as a teacher with a school district that is a participating employer and
the date on which the participant becomes a substitute teacher as an employee or
contractor providing employee services with any school district that is a
participating employer if all of the following conditions are met:
(a)  The participant terminates his or her employment after July 2, 2013.
(b) At the time the participant terminates his or her employment as a teacher
with a school district, the participant does not have an agreement with any school
district that is a participating employer to return to employment as a substitute
teacher or enter into a contract to provide employee services as a substitute teacher
for that school district.
(c) The participant elects on a form provided by the department to not become
a participating employee.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25