House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:10 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 12, Noes 1 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |