House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/09/2023 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Subeck | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |