Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 11:27 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
08/18/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/14/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/10/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/08/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/07/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2023
|
Representatives Billings and Hong added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|