House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Executive action taken by joint committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 10, Noes 5 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/22/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Housing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |