House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 3 | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 3 | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Macco | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Macco and Knodl | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Macco and Knodl | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Senator Stafsholt added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Introduced |