Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 34, Paired 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|