Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 34, Paired 2 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 3 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |