Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:11 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |