Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |