House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on State Affairs pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | ||
House | 07/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |