Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB220 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/03/2023

                            LRB-2576/1
MCP:amn
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 220
April 3, 2023 - Introduced by Representatives ROZAR, EDMING, SHANKLAND, PALMERI
and SNYDER, cosponsored by Senators JAMES, TOMCZYK and SPREITZER.
Referred to Committee on Environment.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
AN ACT to create 20.115 (7) (qg) of the statutes; relating to: funding for the
Fenwood Creek watershed pilot project.
Analysis by the Legislative Reference Bureau
This bill creates an unfunded appropriation from the environmental fund for
the purpose of providing grants to the Fenwood Creek pilot project in Marathon
County to reduce watershed phosphorus and sediment levels.  The bill requires the
Department of Agriculture, Trade and Consumer Protection to request that the Joint
Committee on Finance supplement this appropriation in each year of the 2023-25
fiscal biennium for this purpose, in an amount up to $607,000 in each year.  The bill
also requires DATCP to include a request for funding for this purpose in its 2025-27
budget request.  Under the bill, DATCP must also submit reports to the legislature
before the end of the 2024, 2025, and 2026 fiscal years on how the grant money has
been spent and the results of the Fenwood Creek pilot project in reducing watershed
phosphorus and sediment levels.
For further information see the state and local fiscal estimate, which will be
printed as an appendix to this bill.
The people of the state of Wisconsin, represented in senate and assembly, do
enact as follows:
SECTION 1.  20.005 (3) (schedule) of the statutes:  at the appropriate place, insert
the following amounts for the purposes indicated:
1
2
3
4 - 2 -2023 - 2024  Legislature	LRB-2576/1
MCP:amn
SECTION 1 ASSEMBLY BILL 220
2023-24 2024-25
20.115Agriculture, trade and consumer
protection, department of
(7) AGRICULTURAL RESOURCE MANAGEMENT
(qg)Fenwood Creek watershed pilot
project	SEG A -0- -0-
SECTION 2.  20.115 (7) (qg) of the statutes is created to read:
20.115 (7) (qg)  Fenwood Creek watershed pilot project. From the
environmental fund, the amounts in the schedule for the purpose of providing grants
to the Fenwood Creek pilot project in Marathon County to reduce watershed
phosphorus and sediment levels.
SECTION 3.0Nonstatutory provisions.
(1) SUPPLEMENTAL FUNDING REQUEST.  In each year of the 2023-25 fiscal
biennium, the department of agriculture, trade and consumer protection shall
request under s. 13.101 (3) that the joint committee on finance supplement the
appropriation under s. 20.115 (7) (qg) with sufficient funds from the environmental
fund for the purpose of providing grants to the Fenwood Creek pilot project in
Marathon County to reduce watershed phosphorus and sediment levels.  The
committee may supplement that appropriation for that purpose, in an amount up to
$607,000 in each year of the fiscal biennium, without finding that an emergency
exists under s. 13.101 (3) (a) 1.
(2) REPORTS TO THE LEGISLATURE. No later than June 30, 2024, June 30, 2025,
and June 30, 2026, the department of agriculture, trade and consumer protection
shall submit to the appropriate standing committees of the legislature in the manner
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23 - 3 -2023 - 2024  Legislature
LRB-2576/1
MCP:amn
SECTION 3
 ASSEMBLY BILL 220
provided under s. 13.172 (3) reports on how grant money provided to the Fenwood
Creek pilot project has been spent and the results of that project in reducing
watershed phosphorus and sediment levels.
(3) 2025-27 BIENNIAL BUDGET REQUEST. In submitting information under s. 16.42
for purposes of the 2025-27 biennial budget bill, the department of agriculture, trade
and consumer protection shall include a request to provide funding for the Fenwood
Creek pilot project in Marathon County to reduce watershed phosphorus and
sediment levels.
SECTION 4.0Effective date.
(1) This act takes effect on the day after publication, or on the 2nd day after
publication of the 2023 biennial budget act, whichever is later.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12