House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:10 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Senator Pfaff added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |