House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 08/29/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/09/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/13/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |